SD HB1146 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 H.J. 795
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 H.J. 795
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the consumption of alcoholic beverages by passengers aboard vehicles operated by licensed carriers.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the consumption of alcoholic beverages by passengers aboard vehicles operated by licensed carriers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 H.J. 795 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2018 H.J. 747 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 749 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 689 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 639 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 608 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 485 |
2018-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 444 |
2018-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 430 |
2018-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 413 |
2018-02-07 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 366 |
2018-02-07 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1146wa |
2018-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 172 |