SD HB1146 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions related to unclaimed property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions related to unclaimed property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Government Operations and Audit Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 21, 2019 H.J. 761
2019-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the President S.J. 681
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 710
2019-03-07SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 645
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-03-06SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 622
2019-03-06SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 475
2019-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 463
2019-02-19HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-19HouseGovernment Operations and Audit Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. H.J. 447
2019-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-28HouseReferred to House Government Operations and Audit H.J. 218
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 202

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback