SD HB1150 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a nonbeneficiary student scholarship program for certain students attending tribally controlled colleges and to make an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establish a nonbeneficiary student scholarship program for certain students attending tribally controlled colleges and to make an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Shawn Bordeaux [D] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] | Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D] | Rep. Ray Ring [D] |
Rep. Michael Saba [D] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Sen. Red Foster [D] | Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 459 |
2019-02-20 | House | Education Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 10. |
2019-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to House Education H.J. 219 |
2019-01-25 | House | First Reading House H.J. 203 |