SD HB1159 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2017 H.J. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2017 H.J. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal a certain provision regarding the regulation of commercial breeding operations.
Title
Repeal a certain provision regarding the regulation of commercial breeding operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2017 H.J. 762 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 756 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 739 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 722 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 13. H.J. 713 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 668 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 651 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 622 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 524 |
2017-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 12. H.J. 468 |
2017-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 438 |
2017-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 421 |
2017-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 410 |
2017-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 393 |
2017-02-09 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 358 |
2017-02-09 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. Amendment 1159fb |
2017-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-01 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 249 |