SD HB1159 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal a provision that prohibits hunting mourning doves on public roads and highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal a provision that prohibits hunting mourning doves on public roads and highways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateSigned by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
2019-02-27SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562
2019-02-26SenateSigned by the President S.J. 527
2019-02-25SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 544
2019-02-22SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 19, NAYS 11. S.J. 481
2019-02-21SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 451
2019-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-06SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 281
2019-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 293
2019-01-31HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-31HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 276
2019-01-31HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-28HouseReferred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 219
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 204

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback