SD HB1160 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor H.J. 860
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor H.J. 860
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow certain students to participate in the opportunity scholarship program under certain circumstances.
Title
Allow certain students to participate in the opportunity scholarship program under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 42 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 42 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor H.J. 860 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 856 | |
2010-03-12 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 856 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by President S.J. 677 | |
2010-03-11 | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 10. H.J. 842 | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 659 | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 655 Amendment Cc1160a | |
2010-03-11 | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 831 Amendment Cc1160A | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 635 | |
2010-03-10 | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 805 | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 1. S.J. 589 | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 589 Amendment 1160ch | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 573 | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 495 | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 481 | |
2010-02-23 | Education Title amended, Passed Amendment 1160cta | |
2010-02-23 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 426 | |
2010-02-23 | Education Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. Amendment 1160cd | |
2010-02-23 | Education Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. Amendment 1160cf | |
2010-02-23 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1160ce | |
2010-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-17 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 351 | |
2010-02-16 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 42, NAYS 24. H.J. 403 | |
2010-02-12 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 387 | |
2010-02-11 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 374 | |
2010-02-10 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 6. H.J. 344 | |
2010-02-10 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1160ca | |
2010-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 218 |