SD HB1162 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for special organ donation decals for license plates.
Title
Provide for special organ donation decals for license plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 842 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 735 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 655 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 582 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 542 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 435 |
2013-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 409 |
2013-02-12 | House | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 350 |
2013-02-12 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1162oa |
2013-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 155 |