SD HB1162 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 52-4)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 52-4)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit the practice of sex-selective abortions, to establish certain procedures to better ensure that sex-selective abortions are not practiced in South Dakota, and to provide penalties therefor.
Title
Prohibit the practice of sex-selective abortions, to establish certain procedures to better ensure that sex-selective abortions are not practiced in South Dakota, and to provide penalties therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 790 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 773 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 653 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 750 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 10. H.J. 719 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 5. S.J. 595 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 546 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1162je |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 3. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1162ya |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-20 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 383 |
2014-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 10. H.J. 451 |
2014-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 441 |
2014-02-12 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. H.J. 391 |
2014-02-12 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1162ja |
2014-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 177 |
2014-01-29 | House | First read in House H.J. 154 |