SD HB1163 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions related to the filing of the certificate of limited partnerships.
Title
Revise certain provisions related to the filing of the certificate of limited partnerships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 842 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 814 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 703 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 742 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 0. H.J. 636 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 614 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 614 Amendment 1163jb |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 576 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 561 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 544 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 521 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 514 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 443 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 291 |
2013-01-30 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 251 |
2013-01-28 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-01-28 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 204 |
2013-01-28 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1163ra |
2013-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 155 |