SD HB1176 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the regulation of saline tattoo removal by municipalities.
Title
Provide for the regulation of saline tattoo removal by municipalities.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Nancy Rasmussen [R] | Rep. Marli Wiese [R] | Sen. Deb Soholt [R] |
Sen. Lynn Disanto [R] | Sen. Red Foster [D] | Sen. Kris Langer [R] | Sen. Margaret Sutton [R] |
Sen. Susan Wismer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 06, 2019 H.J. 650 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 618 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 622 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 551 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 532 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-20 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 429 |
2019-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 439 |
2019-02-14 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 406 |
2019-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-29 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 233 |