SD HB1178 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 534
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding the beginning period for absentee voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding the beginning period for absentee voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 36 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27SenateState Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 534
2019-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 475
2019-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 36, NAYS 33. H.J. 469
2019-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 469 Amendment 1178wc
2019-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 453
2019-02-13HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 412
2019-02-13HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1178oc
2019-02-13HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1178oa
2019-02-13HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-29HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 233

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback