SD HB1179 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permit local political subdivisions with volunteer advanced life support personnel to establish deferred compensation plans.
Title
Permit local political subdivisions with volunteer advanced life support personnel to establish deferred compensation plans.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Begalka [R] | Sen. Jim Bradford [D] | Rep. Paul Dennert [D] | Rep. Mitchell Fargen [D] |
Sen. Cooper Garnos [R] | Sen. Bob Gray [R] | Sen. Bernie Hunhoff [D] | Rep. Frank Kloucek [D] |
Sen. Billie Sutton [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor H.J. 740 | |
2011-03-07 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 650 | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by President S.J. 616 | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 610 | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 573 | |
2011-02-28 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-28 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 546 | |
2011-02-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 500 | |
2011-02-22 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 21. H.J. 466 | |
2011-02-17 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 454 | |
2011-02-16 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 433 | |
2011-02-15 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 389 | |
2011-02-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-26 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 185 |
Subjects
Counties
Emergency Medical Technician
Labor and Employment
Local Government
Municipal Government
Public Fiscal Administration
Townships
Emergency Medical Technician
Labor and Employment
Local Government
Municipal Government
Public Fiscal Administration
Townships