SD HB1179 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-7)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor H.J. 768
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-7)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor H.J. 768
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the definition of a veteran.
Title
Revise the definition of a veteran.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 768 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 765 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 666 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 713 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 660 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 608 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 608 Amendment 1179ja |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 578 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 370 |
2015-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 4. H.J. 364 |
2015-02-09 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 351 |
2015-02-06 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 3. H.J. 321 |
2015-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-30 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 246 |