SD HB1185 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate money for the ordinary expenses of the legislative, judicial, and executive departments of the state, the expenses of state institutions, interest on the public debt, and for common schools.
Title
Appropriate money for the ordinary expenses of the legislative, judicial, and executive departments of the state, the expenses of state institutions, interest on the public debt, and for common schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Line Item Veto Consideration (Y: 1 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Deliver line item veto to the Governor H.J. 848 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | House of Representatives Line Item Veto Consideration, Failed, YEAS 1, NAYS 65. H.J. 846 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Line Item Veto H.J. 844 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 838 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 837 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 753 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 752 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Amend the amendment, Passed S.J. 752 Amendment 1185xa |
2013-03-08 | Senate | First read in Senate S.J. 751 |
2013-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 17. H.J. 836 |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. J.J. 827 |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 4. Amendment 1185ah |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 3. Amendment 1185mj |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 1. Amendment 1185uak |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 1. Amendment 1185mak |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 4. Amendment 1185mw |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 6. Amendment 1185uah |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1185mf |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 3. Amendment 1185va |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1185mc |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1185uag |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1185ue |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 3. Amendment 1185mr |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1185de |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 1. Amendment 1185dg |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 2. Amendment 1185mac |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1185du |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1185dt |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 1. Amendment 1185ds |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1185dr |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1185dp |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1185dn |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1185dl |
2013-03-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1185uab |
2013-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 170 |