SD HB1185 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding farm wineries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding farm wineries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 42 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateCommerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 518
2019-02-26SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-07SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 302
2019-02-06HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 42, NAYS 28. H.J. 310
2019-02-05HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 289
2019-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-29HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 234

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback