SD HB1187 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide alternative brand inspection procedures for certain rodeo livestock.
Title
Provide alternative brand inspection procedures for certain rodeo livestock.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 842 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 735 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 655 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 614 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 575 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-20 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 486 |
2013-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 0. H.J. 438 |
2013-02-14 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 400 |
2013-02-14 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1187tb |
2013-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-12 | House | Deferred by Chair, Passed |
2013-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 185 |