SD HB1188 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 467
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding fertilizer inspection fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding fertilizer inspection fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22SenateTaxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 467
2019-02-22SenateTaxation Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 4.
2019-02-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 351
2019-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 4. H.J. 357
2019-02-08HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 343
2019-02-07HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 330
2019-02-05HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 289
2019-02-05HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1188ja
2019-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 250

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback