SD HB1189 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for a period to cure certain campaign finance violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for a period to cure certain campaign finance violations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761
2019-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 706
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the President S.J. 675
2019-03-07SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 701
2019-03-06SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 636
2019-03-05SenateRemove from Consent Calendar S.J. 608
2019-03-04SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-03-04SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 563
2019-03-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-25SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-20SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 429
2019-02-19HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 432
2019-02-13HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-13HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 407
2019-02-13HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 250

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback