SD HB1189 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020 H.J. 630
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020 H.J. 630
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to expand rural? access to broadband services and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to expand rural? access to broadband services and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Karr [R] | Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020 H.J. 630 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 491 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 467 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 437 |
2020-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 14. H.J. 475 |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1189A |
2020-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 256 |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 98 |