SD HB1193 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain programs and promote efficiency in state government.
Title
Revise certain programs and promote efficiency in state government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. H.J. 544 |
2018-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 197 |