SD HB1195 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the collection of fees for certain educational programming and services, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize the collection of fees for certain educational programming and services, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor H.J. 720 | |
2012-02-24 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 615 | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by President S.J. 548 | |
2012-02-22 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 559 | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 6. S.J. 489 | |
2012-02-16 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 462 | |
2012-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-02 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 262 | |
2012-02-01 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 12. H.J. 285 | |
2012-01-30 | Education Title amended, Passed Amendment 1195cta | |
2012-01-30 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 5. H.J. 236 | |
2012-01-30 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1195cb | |
2012-01-30 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1195ca | |
2012-01-30 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 159 |