SD HB1195 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - Placed on calendar, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 19.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - Placed on calendar, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 19.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Declare void the transgender policy of the South Dakota High School Activities Association and to establish a determinant in identifying a student's sexual identity for the purpose of participation in high school athletics.
Title
Declare void the transgender policy of the South Dakota High School Activities Association and to establish a determinant in identifying a student's sexual identity for the purpose of participation in high school athletics.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Placed on calendar (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education Do Not Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education Do Not Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Senate | Placed on calendar, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 19. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Education Do Not Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 646 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7), Passed S.J. 636 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 557 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 370 |
2015-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 16. H.J. 369 |
2015-02-09 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 338 |
2015-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 284 |
2015-02-03 | House | First read in House H.J. 259 |