SD HB1198 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Define activities that constitute human trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Define activities that constitute human trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateSigned by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
2019-02-27SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562
2019-02-26SenateSigned by the President S.J. 527
2019-02-22SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 485
2019-02-21SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 461
2019-02-20SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 414
2019-02-20SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-13SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 368
2019-02-12HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 380
2019-02-08HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 340
2019-02-08HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1198ba
2019-02-08HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 252

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback