SD HB1199 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions related to the distribution of funds to sparse school districts.
Title
Revise certain provisions related to the distribution of funds to sparse school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by Governor H.J. 734 | |
2012-02-28 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 661 | |
2012-02-27 | Signed by President S.J. 587 | |
2012-02-24 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 615 | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 1. S.J. 541 | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 510 | |
2012-02-21 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 480 | |
2012-02-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 439 | |
2012-02-14 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 465 | |
2012-02-10 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. H.J. 407 | |
2012-02-10 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1199ba | |
2012-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 160 |