SD HB1206 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 H.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 H.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the commitment of a delinquent child to the Department of Corrections.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the commitment of a delinquent child to the Department of Corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 H.J. 626 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 491 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 546 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 457 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1206A |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 189 |
2020-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 241 |
2020-02-07 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-07 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 117 |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 98 |