SD HB1207 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow the consignment or auction of certain out-of-state vehicles and motorcycles.
Title
Allow the consignment or auction of certain out-of-state vehicles and motorcycles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor H.J. 740 | |
2011-03-07 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 650 | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by President S.J. 616 | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 610 | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 575 | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 553 | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 542 | |
2011-02-24 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 520 | |
2011-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 402 | |
2011-02-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 343 | |
2011-02-07 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 295 | |
2011-02-07 | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1207se | |
2011-02-07 | Amend the amendment, Passed Amendment 1207sc | |
2011-02-07 | Amend the amendment, Passed Amendment 1207sb | |
2011-02-07 | Amend the amendment, Passed Amendment 1207sa | |
2011-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 217 |