SD HB1216 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase certain civil penalties for fleeing from police.
Title
Increase certain civil penalties for fleeing from police.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R] | Rep. Doug Barthel [R] | Rep. Scyller Borglum [R] | Sen. Michael Diedrich [R] |
Rep. Chris Johnson [R] | Sen. Alan Solano [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 706 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 647 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 670 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 10. S.J. 611 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 600 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 556 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 520 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 498 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 389 |
2019-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 7. H.J. 396 |
2019-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 396 Amendment 1216xa |
2019-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 382 |
2019-02-11 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 352 |
2019-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-30 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 256 |