SD HB1224 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Withdrawn at the Request of the Prime Sponsor H.J. 450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Withdrawn at the Request of the Prime Sponsor H.J. 450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding violations of county and municipal ordinances.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding violations of county and municipal ordinances.
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Frye-Mueller [R] | Rep. Drew Dennert [R] | Rep. Kevin Jensen [R] | Sen. Tom Pischke [R] |
Rep. Tony Randolph [R] | Sen. Stace Nelson [R] | Sen. Lynn Disanto [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | Withdrawn at the Request of the Prime Sponsor H.J. 450 |
2019-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to House Local Government H.J. 280 |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 257 |
Subjects
South Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1224&Session=2019 |
Text | http://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1224P.pdf |