SD HB1227 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2020 H.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2020 H.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation for the rural veterinary medical education program and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation for the rural veterinary medical education program and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Gross [R] | Rep. David Anderson [R] | Rep. Hugh Bartels [R] | Rep. Fred Deutsch [R] |
Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Spencer Gosch [R] | Rep. Paul Miskimins [R] | Rep. Marty Overweg [R] |
Rep. Kent Peterson [R] | Rep. Sue Lucas-Peterson [R] | Rep. Doug Post [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] |
Rep. James Wangsness [R] | Rep. Marli Wiese [R] | Sen. VJ Smith [R] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] |
Sen. John Lake [R] | Sen. Jeff Partridge [R] | Sen. Jim White [R] | Sen. John Wiik [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2020 H.J. 626 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 491 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 459 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 437 |
2020-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 7. H.J. 474 |
2020-03-02 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 1. |
2020-03-02 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1227B |
2020-03-02 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1227A |
2020-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 242 |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading House H.J. 169 |