SD HB1228 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the bonding limit for the four technical institutes.
Title
Increase the bonding limit for the four technical institutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor H.J. 740 | |
2011-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 727 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by President S.J. 677 | |
2011-03-08 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 688 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 636 | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 616 | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 599 | |
2011-03-01 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 566 | |
2011-03-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-24 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-17 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 469 | |
2011-02-16 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 430 | |
2011-02-14 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 365 | |
2011-02-14 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1228ca | |
2011-02-14 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 222 |