SD HB1228 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor H.J. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor H.J. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish an obligation recovery center.
Title
Establish an obligation recovery center.
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Rep. Dan Dryden [R] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Rep. Mark Mickelson [R] |
Sen. Dean Wink [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 46 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 46 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 46 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 46 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 800 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 797 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 730 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 785 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 19, NAYS 15. S.J. 717 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 46, NAYS 23. H.J. 752 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 743 Amendment cc1228a |
2015-03-12 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 737 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 692 Amendment Cc1228a |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 687 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 729 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 46, NAYS 23. H.J. 728 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Intent to reconsider H.J. 725 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 17. S.J. 650 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. S.J. 633 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1228sb |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1228ga |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 529 |
2015-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 11. H.J. 526 |
2015-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 526 Amendment 1228oc |
2015-02-24 | House | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. H.J. 481 |
2015-02-24 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1228ob |
2015-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-20 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2015-02-20 | House | Appropriations Title amended, Passed Amendment 1228ota |
2015-02-20 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1228oa |
2015-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to House Appropriations, Passed H.J. 326 |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 285 |
2015-02-03 | House | First read in House H.J. 266 |