SD HB1234 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide incentives to teach in critical need areas, to provide for rewards for the best teachers and those teaching in math and science subject areas, to revise certain provisions regarding evaluation of teachers, to create a system for evaluating principals, to distinguish between tenured and nontenured teachers, to revise certain provisions regarding the employment of teachers, and to repeal provisions regarding the teacher compensation assistance program.
Title
Provide incentives to teach in critical need areas, to provide for rewards for the best teachers and those teaching in math and science subject areas, to revise certain provisions regarding evaluation of teachers, to create a system for evaluating principals, to distinguish between tenured and nontenured teachers, to revise certain provisions regarding the employment of teachers, and to repeal provisions regarding the teacher compensation assistance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 36 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 41 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 41 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by Governor H.J. 734 | |
2012-03-02 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 730 | |
2012-03-01 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 718 | |
2012-03-01 | Signed by President S.J. 647 | |
2012-02-29 | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 36, NAYS 33. H.J. 684 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 12. S.J. 584 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 5. S.J. 582 Amendment 1234oa | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 577 Amendment 1234mc | |
2012-02-23 | Education Title amended, Passed Amendment 1234ctb | |
2012-02-23 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 517 | |
2012-02-23 | Education Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. Amendment 1234cl | |
2012-02-23 | Education Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 1234cj | |
2012-02-23 | Amend the amendment, Passed Amendment 1234cp | |
2012-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-14 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 406 | |
2012-02-13 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 41, NAYS 28. H.J. 439 | |
2012-02-13 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 437 Amendment 1234ci | |
2012-02-08 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 4. H.J. 370 | |
2012-02-08 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1234cf | |
2012-02-08 | Education Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 1234cd | |
2012-02-08 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 199 |