SD HB1237 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establish the duty to collect data and share information on missing and murdered indigenous persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish the duty to collect data and share information on missing and murdered indigenous persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 451
2019-02-19HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 433
2019-02-13HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 406
2019-02-13HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31HouseReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 280
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 260

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback