SD HB1238 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 0. H.J. 451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 0. H.J. 451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions regarding training on missing and murdered indigenous persons.
Title
Revise provisions regarding training on missing and murdered indigenous persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 0. H.J. 451 |
2019-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 433 |
2019-02-13 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 406 |
2019-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 280 |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 260 |