SD HB1240 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - Delivered veto override to the Secretary of State H.J. 879
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - Delivered veto override to the Secretary of State H.J. 879
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create the South Dakota need-based grant fund, to provide for the awarding of certain need-based grants, and to repeal provisions relating to tuition equalization grants.
Title
Create the South Dakota need-based grant fund, to provide for the awarding of certain need-based grants, and to repeal provisions relating to tuition equalization grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Veto override (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Veto override (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Referred to House Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Veto override (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Referred to House Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Delivered veto override to the Secretary of State H.J. 879 | |
2010-03-29 | Veto override, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 689 | |
2010-03-29 | Veto override, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 865 | |
2010-03-29 | Vetoed by the Governor H.J. 861 | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 846 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 644 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 801 | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 11. S.J. 595 | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 573 | |
2010-03-03 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 536 | |
2010-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 461 | |
2010-02-23 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 6. H.J. 586 | |
2010-02-22 | Appropriations Title amended, Passed Amendment 1240mta | |
2010-02-22 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. H.J. 501 | |
2010-02-22 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1240ma | |
2010-02-19 | Referred to House Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 2. H.J. 482 | |
2010-02-19 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-02-19 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-02 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 265 |