SD HB1262 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to reimburse certain health care professionals who have complied with the requirements for certain health care recruitment assistance programs and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to reimburse certain health care professionals who have complied with the requirements for certain health care recruitment assistance programs and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 04, 2019 H.J. 596 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 556 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 579 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 526 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 512 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 476 |
2019-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 471 |
2019-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 453 |
2019-02-19 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 427 |
2019-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 327 |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 281 |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 265 |