SD HB1263 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor H.J. 860
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor H.J. 860
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to the terms of wind easements and wind energy leases.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to the terms of wind easements and wind energy leases.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Abdallah [R] | Rep. Bob Faehn [R] | Sen. Cooper Garnos [R] | Sen. Bob Gray [R] |
Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Rep. David Lust [R] | Rep. Nick Moser [R] |
Rep. Kristi Noem [R] | Sen. Timothy Rave [R] | Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] | Rep. Roger Solum [R] |
Rep. Larry Tidemann [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor H.J. 860 | |
2010-03-08 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 755 | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by President S.J. 573 | |
2010-03-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 688 | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 532 | |
2010-03-01 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 484 | |
2010-03-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 461 | |
2010-02-23 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 581 | |
2010-02-18 | State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 1263ttc | |
2010-02-18 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 484 | |
2010-02-18 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1263oa | |
2010-02-18 | State Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 1263te | |
2010-02-03 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 290 |