SD HB1264 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor H.J. 860
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor H.J. 860
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the issuance of free antlerless deer licenses to certain landowners and lessees.
Title
Provide for the issuance of free antlerless deer licenses to certain landowners and lessees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor H.J. 860 | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 846 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 644 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 817 | |
2010-03-10 | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 4. H.J. 807 | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 14. S.J. 596 | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 573 | |
2010-03-02 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. S.J. 506 | |
2010-03-02 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1264te | |
2010-03-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-25 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Deferred to another day, Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1264td | |
2010-02-25 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. Amendment 1264tc | |
2010-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-19 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 389 | |
2010-02-18 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 15. H.J. 474 | |
2010-02-16 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 394 | |
2010-02-16 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. Amendment 1264ta | |
2010-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-11 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-03 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 290 |