SD HB1264 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the payment of a self-insured retention on a cyber liability insurance policy from the extraordinary litigation fund, to make an appropriation for the payment of extraordinary litigation expenses, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize the payment of a self-insured retention on a cyber liability insurance policy from the extraordinary litigation fund, to make an appropriation for the payment of extraordinary litigation expenses, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 H.J. 761 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 681 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 710 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 654 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 632 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 607 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 595 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 546 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 369 |
2019-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 377 |
2019-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 363 |
2019-02-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 338 |
2019-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 282 |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 265 |