SD HB1265 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 5. H.J. 745
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding certain tax rates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding certain tax rates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 38 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 38 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-22 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House State Affairs Reconsidered (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateHouse of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 5. H.J. 745
2019-03-12SenateHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 743 Amendment Cc1265a
2019-03-12SenateHouse of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 724
2019-03-12SenateSenate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 3. S.J. 712
2019-03-12SenateSenate Conference Committee Report S.J. 711 Amendment Cc1265a
2019-03-12SenateSenate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 701
2019-03-11SenateHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 715
2019-03-07SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 650
2019-03-06SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 627
2019-03-06SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1265wd
2019-03-06SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-26SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 521
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 38, NAYS 30. H.J. 542
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 38, NAYS 30. H.J. 541
2019-02-25HouseIntent to reconsider H.J. 539
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 35, NAYS 33. H.J. 539
2019-02-22HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 502
2019-02-22HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1265ob
2019-02-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-20HouseState Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 1265ota
2019-02-20HouseState Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 1265oa
2019-02-20HouseState Affairs Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
2019-02-20HouseState Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2.
2019-02-20HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 9.
2019-02-20HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31HouseReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 282
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 265

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1265&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1265P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1265HST.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1265SST.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28529&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28530&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28526&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28740&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28827&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28830&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28831&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29230&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29302&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29492&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29496&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback