SD HB1266 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reduce the period of time necessary to cure and validate certain adoption proceedings.
Title
Reduce the period of time necessary to cure and validate certain adoption proceedings.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Begalka [R] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Rep. Lora Hubbel [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] |
Rep. Melissa Magstadt [R] | Rep. Nick Moser [R] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] | Rep. Val Rausch [R] |
Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] | Rep. Burt Tulson [R] | Rep. Mark Venner [R] | Rep. Hal Wick [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by Governor H.J. 734 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 | |
2012-02-29 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 688 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by President S.J. 629 | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 603 | |
2012-02-27 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 569 | |
2012-02-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-24 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 440 | |
2012-02-14 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 473 | |
2012-02-13 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 448 | |
2012-02-13 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1266ra | |
2012-02-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 221 |