SD HB1271 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2018 H.J. 796
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2018 H.J. 796
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the carrying of certain guns on certain premises.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the carrying of certain guns on certain premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2018 H.J. 796 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2018 H.J. 747 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 749 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 689 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 6. S.J. 674 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 628 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 486 |
2018-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 7. H.J. 459 |
2018-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 430 |
2018-02-12 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 396 |
2018-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 251 |