SD HB1292 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2018 H.J. 796
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2018 H.J. 796
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the process by which courts consider appeals of decisions regarding conditional use requests.
Title
Revise the process by which courts consider appeals of decisions regarding conditional use requests.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Kettwig [R] | Sen. Timothy Johns [R] | Rep. David Lust [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] |
Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] | Rep. Gary Cammack [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2018 H.J. 796 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2018 H.J. 747 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 749 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 689 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 675 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 628 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 527 |
2018-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 20. H.J. 493 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-14 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 453 |
2018-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-01 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 286 |