SD HB1297 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2018 H.J. 796
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2018 H.J. 796
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding capital outlay obligations.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding capital outlay obligations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2018 H.J. 796 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 777 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2018 H.J. 778 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 760 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 728 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 721 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 654 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1297ja |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1297jb |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 581 |
2018-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 560 |
2018-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 560 Amendment 1297ka |
2018-02-21 | House | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 2. H.J. 510 |
2018-02-21 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1297ba |
2018-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-01 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 287 |