SD HB1308 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the distribution of revenue from the alcoholic beverage fund.
Title
Revise the distribution of revenue from the alcoholic beverage fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Wismer [D] | Rep. Dan Ahlers [D] | Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] | Rep. Leslie Heinemann [R] |
Rep. Elizabeth May [R] | Rep. Mark Mickelson [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] | Sen. Joshua Klumb [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 38 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 38 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 684 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 601 |
2018-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 38, NAYS 18. H.J. 591 |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on calendar, Passed H.J. 556 |
2018-02-22 | House | Taxation Title amended, Passed H.J. 547 Amendment 1308fta |
2018-02-22 | House | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 1. |
2018-02-22 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1308fa |
2018-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to House Taxation, Passed H.J. 313 |
2018-02-01 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 289 |