SD HCR1004 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Enrolled on January 29 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 149
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 29 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 149
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing Hot Springs as "The Veterans Town."
Title
Recognizing Hot Springs as "The Veterans Town."
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Verchio [R] | Rep. Gary Cammack [R] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Sen. Jenna Netherton [R] |
Rep. Leslie Heinemann [R] | Rep. Steve Hickey [R] | Rep. Don Kopp [R] | Rep. Elizabeth May [R] |
Sen. David Novstrup [R] | Rep. Lee Qualm [R] | Rep. Ray Ring [D] | Rep. Tim Rounds [R] |
Rep. Tona Rozum [R] | Rep. Dean Schrempp [D] | Rep. Jacqueline Sly [R] | Rep. Roger Solum [R] |
Rep. Kathy Tyler [D] | Rep. Hal Wick [R] | Sen. Bruce Rampelberg [R] | Sen. Tim Begalka [R] |
Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Sen. Chuck Welke [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 149 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 127 |
2014-01-24 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 98 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 77 |