SD HCR1004 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 5 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 9. S.J. 301
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 5 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 9. S.J. 301
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Addressed to the United States Supreme Court setting forth certain facts and expressly enumerating the grievances of the People of the State of South Dakota, through their elected representatives, with that Court's decision in Roe v. Wade, 410 U.S. 113 (1973), and its progeny and calling for that Court to now protect the intrinsic, natural, fundamental rights of the children of our State and nation and the intrinsic, natural, fundamental rights of their pregnant mothers in their relationship with their children, and the mothers' health by reconsidering and overturning the court's decision in Roe.
Title
Addressed to the United States Supreme Court setting forth certain facts and expressly enumerating the grievances of the People of the State of South Dakota, through their elected representatives, with that Court's decision in Roe v. Wade, 410 U.S. 113 (1973), and its progeny and calling for that Court to now protect the intrinsic, natural, fundamental rights of the children of our State and nation and the intrinsic, natural, fundamental rights of their pregnant mothers in their relationship with their children, and the mothers' health by reconsidering and overturning the court's decision in Roe.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 9. S.J. 301 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 259 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 245 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 10. H.J. 224 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 177 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 144 |