SD HCR1004 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the property rights of ranch and range allotment owners.
Title
Expressing support for the property rights of ranch and range allotment owners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Tabled (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Senate | Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 446 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary, Passed S.J. 245 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 232 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 219 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 250 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 231 |