SD HCR1004 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 2 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 386
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 2 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 386
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the Governor to fuel the state fleet with premium E-30 fuel.
Title
Urging the Governor to fuel the state fleet with premium E-30 fuel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 56 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Transportation Adopt Resolution (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Transportation Adopt Resolution (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 56 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Transportation Adopt Resolution (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Transportation Adopt Resolution (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 386 |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced S.J. 366 |
2018-02-02 | House | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 10. H.J. 312 |
2018-02-01 | House | Transportation Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 276 |
2018-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-23 | House | Introduced and referred to House Transportation H.J. 145 |