SD HCR1006 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 30 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 30 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the anniversary of the addition of the words "under God" to the United States Pledge of Allegiance.
Title
Recognizing the anniversary of the addition of the words "under God" to the United States Pledge of Allegiance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 165 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 149 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 114 |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 99 |